Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hahn, Michael J, against Aardex Corporation, Aardex Fresno Borssa, Llc, Aardex Properties Iv, Llc, Aardex Properties, Llc, Commonwealth Land Title Company, (total of 17) See All represented by Burg, Edward G., Corbett, Janile, Liao, Gabriel, Montoya, Bobbie J, Renfro, Kristen, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Order filed
Date: September 10, 2015Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 02, 2015Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 30, 2015Statement filed
Date: October 20, 2015Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 02, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 21, 2015Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 07, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 20, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 03, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 03, 2016Notice of Motion
Date: February 09, 2016Order filed
Date: October 14, 2015Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 06, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 10, 2016Statement filed
Date: May 26, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 22, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 10, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: April 25, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 26, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 26, 2016Order filed
Date: February 11, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 03, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 08, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 19, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 07, 2016Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed
Date: March 21, 2017Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed
Date: March 22, 2017Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed
Date: March 22, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 02, 2016Reply filed
Date: July 11, 2016Answer Filed
Date: May 31, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 09, 2016Request for Judical Notice
Date: January 06, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: September 01, 2016Answer Filed
Date: June 29, 2016Statement filed
Date: November 28, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Answer Filed
Date: February 16, 2016Request Filed
Date: July 11, 2016Reply filed
Date: July 11, 2016Notice of Motion
Date: October 20, 2015Stipulation and Order filed
Date: April 26, 2016Stipulation Filed
Date: January 17, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 27, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 19, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 21, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 26, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: January 17, 2017Order filed
Date: February 23, 2016Opposition filed
Date: October 05, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 15, 2015Stipulation Filed
Date: February 09, 2016Request for Judical Notice
Date: September 01, 2016Request for Judical Notice
Date: February 09, 2016Notice of Motion
Date: September 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Erick Solares Re Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal - (no action taken as no order was provided) |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing OSC-Dismissal Hearing |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Michael Hann continued per TR from 12/7/16 Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed proof of service by mail |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.