Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Affirmative Insurance Company, filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case represented by Colman, Jonathan H, against 21St Century Company, Calvert, Sean, City Of Fresno, Fresno Police Department, Garcia, Regina Esther, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Ikeda, Dale presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2015 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions296 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time325 days |
Dismissal Not Entered
Date: May 03, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 13, 2015Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: May 06, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 25, 2016Dismissal Not Entered
Date: April 07, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: May 03, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: April 07, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 08, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 21, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Full Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal - Entire Action |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: line # 1.b. is incomplete. |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: With and without prejudice are both marked. Nothing is marked for # 1 b as to what is being dismissed. |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.