Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kissee, Danielle D., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mullanax, M. Greg, against Schmiedeke, Maralyn, Young'S Market Company, Llc, represented by Eddings, Ryan L., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 16, 2015 |
Category36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination |
Time To Trial622 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time206 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both with an estimated time of 5-7 days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Deposit, payment,disbursment Jury Fee Deposit on behalf of Plaintiff |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Deposit, payment,disbursment Jury Fees paid for defendants |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: To be determined |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.