Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The State Of California, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Wong, Derek D, against American Securities Company, Buzz Oates Enterprises Ii, Buzz Oates Enterprises, Ii A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Buzz Oates Llc, California Limited Liability Company, Oates Associates Investors, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by O'Neil, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management127 days |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2015 |
Category14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Time To Trial686 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time638 days |
Statement filed
Date: January 24, 2017Order filed
Date: November 04, 2015Stipulation Filed
Date: October 27, 2015Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 25, 2015Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 28, 2015List filed
Date: January 24, 2017Statement filed
Date: January 24, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 17, 2016Response filed
Date: October 27, 2015ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: February 11, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 11, 2016Ex parte Filed
Date: October 27, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 13, 2015Notice of Motion
Date: September 10, 2015Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 10, 2015Answer Filed
Date: August 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both parties with estimated time of 3-10 days. Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Lodged Materials Received Plaintiff's List of Expert Witnesses and Statement of Valuation Data (CCP secs. 1258.240, 1258.260) |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement of Value Marty Willett 1804 Statement filed Statement of Valuation Data of Marty Willett |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
List of Expert Witnesses 1804 List filed List of Expert Witnesses per CCP Sec 1258.240 |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement of Value Gregg Palmer 1804 Statement filed Statement of Valuation Data of Gregg Palmer |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.