Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Fleetwood, Eric J., against Bowen, Daniel E, represented by Mcguinness, Brady K., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial598 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time570 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 08, 2016Notice of Motion
Date: October 22, 2015Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 07, 2016Order filed
Date: August 12, 2016Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: September 15, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 17, 2015Order Received for Signature
Date: August 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requeted by both parties with estimated time of 7-9 days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) Writ of Possession |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Amanda De Jesus Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
September 14, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: Plaintiff’s Motion for Order of Possession Tentative Ruling: To grant. Explanation: Plaintiff The State of California, acting by and through the State Public Works Board (“Plaintiff”) seeks an...
Judge: Jeff Hamilton |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order filed release of deposit Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.