Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Banda-Wash, Maria S, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Harralson, Daniel L., against Hutchins, Guy, Reimer, Peggy, Wash, Janet, Wash, John, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1422 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 26, 2015Ex parte Filed
Date: November 18, 2015Opposition filed
Date: August 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: By Defendants John Wash and Peggy Remier to Strike or Tax Plaintiff’s Memo of Costs Tentative Ruling: To deny defendants John Wash and Peggy Reimer’s motions to strike the entire memo of costs...
Judge: Rosemary McGuire |
|
July 26, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: Defendant/Cross-Complainant John Wash’s Demurrer to First Amended Answer to Cross-Complaint, and Motion to Strike Portions of Cross-Complaint Tentative Ruling: To overrule the demurrer to the ...
Judge: Donald Black |
|
July 20, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: Defendant’s Motion for an Order Continuing Action and Cross-Action or to Stay Action and Cross-Action Tentative Ruling: To deny the defendant’s motion for a continuance or stay of the action a...
Judge: Donald Black |
|
May 18, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: John Wash’s Demurrer to Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint Tentative Ruling: To overrule the demurrer to the answer to the second amended cross-complaint as to the first, second, and nin...
Judge: Donald Black |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing John Wash MPI Judge: Black, Donald |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex parte Filed Notice and Exparte Application for Order to Show Cause and for Preliminary Injunction Against Plaintiff |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Judical Notice | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.