Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chavez, Mario, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Webb, Lenden F., against Morales, Guadalupe, Sunshine Agricultural Services, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Dalesandro, Samuel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2015 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions453 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time875 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 11, 2017Notice Filed
Date: April 20, 2017Notice Filed
Date: May 09, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 01, 2017Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro
Date: March 23, 2017Order Granted
Date: April 11, 2017Order Denied
Date: February 06, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 23, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 11, 2017Motion filed
Date: March 01, 2017Notice Filed
Date: December 21, 2016Judgment Received
Date: December 21, 2016Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: December 21, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 22, 2016Request for Court Judgment
Date: December 21, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 17, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 22, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 14, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Lien |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney Lenden Webb Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed Amended Notice of Entry of Order - Mario Chavez |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granted Motion to be Relieved as Counsel. Effective upon the filing of the proof of service of this signed order upon the client. Judge: Simpson, Alan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.