Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sterling Jewelers, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zeller, Stephen S, against Wright, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryOther Collections Limited (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions547 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time547 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of New Attorney of Record for Judgment Assignee, DNF Associates LLC | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ (Filed) | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Of Costs |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ (Issued) | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment: Issued | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order DECLARATION RE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/0R LOST INSTRUMENT AND ORDER |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Request: Enter Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.