Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zumstein, Lucille F. filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time461 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the First or Final Account Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition - Distribution Final Report and Petition for Settlement Thereof; For Allowance of Attorney's Compensation; For Allowance of Cost Advanced; and Petition for Final Distribution Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Final Distribution
Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hrg: 8/8/16 |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition for Final Distribution Final Report and Petition for Settlement Thereof; for Allowance of Attorneys' Compensation; for Allowance of Costs Advanced; and Petition for Final Distribution (no orders submitted) |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisal Total Amount: $156,815.81 (Final) |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice to Franchise Tax Board |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice to Department of Health Care Services |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Letters (Estates) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.