Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Laura, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Donald, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Zepeda, Francine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZepeda, Francine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time420 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Marital Status Ends 02/23/17 |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Old Atty: Cindy J. Hopper New Atty: Pro Se |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Dept 201 Judgment OAH of 01/05/17 for signature |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Accepted Pending Judge's Signature of Judgment OAH of 01/05/17 |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to sent Envelopes to E-filing desk |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Accepted Pending Judge's Signature Re: Judgment |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Zepeda, Francine |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge Zepeda Minute Order. See Attached. D201-J Stroud Rtp: N Duarte Parties have reached a stipulated agreement, Attorney Hopper to recite for the record, and prepare the Judgment to be submitted for the Courts signature. Court finds: This is an uncontested dissolution of marriage. Parties waive rights to notice of trial, written statement of decision, right to move for a new trial and right to appeal. Both parties stipulates to the 2105 waiver. Judgment granted. Court acquired jurisdiction on 03/02/2016 by Response. Judgment effective upon date of filing. Wife's former name reserved. Judgment effective upon date of filing or no less than 6 months and 1 day from jurisdictional date. See attached: Mr Davis shall be awarded - the residence at 17435 Lacanada in Madera Ca. -All furnishings, jewelry, household furniture in his possession. -2002 Ford F150 -All bank accounts, credit cards and consumer debt in his name -Auto Pension Trust Account Mrs Davis shall be awarded: -Triple Wide Mobile Home -All furnishings, jewelry, household furniture in her pssession -2006 Santurn Ion -All bank accounts, credit cards, and consumer debt in her name -Bank of America IRA account -Bank of America Pension Stock Mr Davis shall pay Ms Davis a onetime equalization payment in the amount of $2500.00 by cashiers check upon her signature on the Judgment. Parties agree the personal outstanding loan of $10,000.00 Mrs Davis owes Mr. Davis is considered paid in full. Each party to pay their own Attorney fees and cost. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.