Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Shields, Virginia, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Roberts, Steven P., against Lester, Kevin, Medical Doctor, represented by Wayte, Lawrence E., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSimpson, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
Category45 Unlimited - Medical Malpractice |
Time To Trial552 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time499 days |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2016ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: March 11, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 21, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 02, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: May 11, 2017Civil Complaint filed
Date: December 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both with an estimated time of 7-8 days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Firm Name Change |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.