Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Adams, Troy, Arroyo, Lorena, Barrios, Maria, Barrios, Ricardo, Casteneda, Javier Morales, (total of 23) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Harmata, Donald D., Kurtz, Christina, against Beazer Homes Holding Corp, Browning Contractors, Inc., Kenyon Plastering, Inc, represented by Amundson, Anna T., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions477 days |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time296 days |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 18, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 02, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 24, 2016Document received, not filed
Date: June 22, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 28, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 21, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 30, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 29, 2016Amendment filed
Date: July 28, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: September 07, 2016Answer Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: October 13, 2016Answer Filed
Date: September 12, 2016Answer Filed
Date: September 09, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 27, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 20, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 28, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 02, 2016Notice of Motion
Date: November 02, 2016Cross Complaint Filed
Date: October 27, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 01, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 14, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 01, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 15, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 07, 2016Answer Filed
Date: December 21, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: December 28, 2016Answer Filed
Date: February 14, 2017Cross Complaint Filed
Date: March 10, 2017Answer Filed
Date: March 10, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: March 16, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 13, 2017Answer Filed
Date: April 07, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 18, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 14, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 14, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 06, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 02, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 17, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: May 17, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: May 17, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: December 12, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: January 31, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 27, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: March 20, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: December 20, 2016Answer Filed
Date: April 13, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: June 22, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 27, 2016Answer Filed
Date: October 27, 2016Notice Filed
Date: December 28, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 20, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: February 06, 2017Notice Filed
Date: June 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: By Cross-Defendant ISI Design and Installation Solutions, Inc. fka Creative Touch Interiors, Inc. For Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Tentative Ruling: To continue the hearing to 3:00 ...
Judge: Jeffrey Y. Hamilton |
|
September 13, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: Motions for Determination of Good Faith Settlements between Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants Elite Landscaping, Inc., Marble Palace, Inc., and Don Black, respectively, and between Plaintiffs an...
Judge: Jeff Hamilton |
|
July 24, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: For Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Tentative Ruling: To deny the motion without prejudice. Explanation: A party to a settlement may apply for an order determining the settlement was m...
Judge: Jeff Hamilton |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Handling Attorney |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Stipulation and Order filed set aside default as to Metropolitan Interior Designs, Inc. Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre stipulation set aside default Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
1526396 Order Received for Signature Order signed and issued. Ff to clerks office 05/25/2017, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept 402 on 5/24/17 Order: Set Aside Defult |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting Complex Fees Notice Filed |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Defendant's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.