Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Norman, Anthony, Norman, Teresa, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Cuttone, Brian K., against Crown, Joseph Donald, Joseph Crown Construction And Development Inc, A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
Category26 Unlimited - Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time273 days |
Notice or Order Staying Action
Date: February 25, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 26, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: September 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing ASC set for 5/26/16 at 10am Dept. #401 |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice or Order Staying Action | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.