Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CACH VS SIMPSON, JOSEPH A
A Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case was filed by Cach, represented by Dufek, David Sean, against Simpson, Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. Judge Glusman, Robert presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 07, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Butte County, CA
Category
Pre-JBSIS Civil Limited
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 8 months and 5 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLTF'S ATTORNEY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE STATUS & IF SANCTIONS PAID Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: $400.00 DAVID SEAN SUFEK Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC: WHY $400 SANCTIONS NOT IMPOSED FOR Desc2: NO POS OR PUBLICATION Disp Code: 906 - CONT TO 12/2/14 FOR STATUS;SANCTIONS IMP Disp Clerk: AMI Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE Desc2: DEFENDANT Notice Date: 2014-06-05 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED AND WHY $440 SANC NOT ORDERED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: OSC FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE DEFENDANT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K COMPLAINT FILED - 30 DAY Summons ISSUED (UNDER 10K) CK#326694 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 658115 Fee Amount: 225.00 Entry Clerk: JMS 538 - $225.00 |