Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dausey, Anna P, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Burkhardt, Robena, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Clare Keithley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2013 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time628 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] RFO: ELDER ABUSE R/O Desc2: FILED 4/25/13 TEMPS GRANTED Desc3: 1ST REISSUANCE Disp Code: 399 - HEARD, TRO SET ASIDE, CASE DISMISSED Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO EA/TRO AS TO [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BAN | |
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: ELDER ABUSE R/O Desc2: FILED: 04/25/13 Desc3: *TEMPS GRANTED* Disp Code: 940 - REISSUED TO 06/05/13 Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF NEW HEARING DATE AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE PP H/D CCPOR HON. CLARE KEITHLEY; JUDGE (B17) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING AND TO REISSUE TRO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRO IN PERSON 4/26/13 AS TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF COURT HEARING HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER *TEMPS GRANTED* *PP HD* HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order PETITION TO PREVENT ELDER ABUSE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.