Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Paradise Police Dept, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Habib, Mark A, against Holt, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management52 days |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
Category(43) Judicial Determination - Return Of Firearms (Wi 8102) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF JUDGMENT ON PETN SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF FIREARMS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Desc: [P] PET: FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION Desc2: OF FIREARMS OR DEADLY WEAPONS Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: NCE Filing Clerk: NCE Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: NCE Filing Clerk: NCE Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PETN SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RELATING TO RETURN OF FIREARMS DEADLY/WEAPON Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF HRG & HRG ON PETN FOR DETERMINATION OF FIREARMS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference NTC OF ASSIGNMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING NTC OF ASSIGNMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE |
|
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RELATING TO RETURN OF FIREARMS OR DEADLY WEAPONS Fee Type: W3 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: NCE 534 - $435.00 |
|
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.