Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcdermott, Tina, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Maynes, Neil, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time752 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING *AGREEMENT REACHED* Desc2: [P] RFO: HARASSMENT Desc3: FILED: 01/07/13 Disp Code: 252 - DISMISSED IN OPEN COURT Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR RESPT: OLD ATTY: MCHUGH NEW ATTY: IN PRO PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER (NON DV) -EXPIRES 7/15/13- ATTY H/D CCPOR HON. LEONARD GOLDKIND; COMMISSIONER (B14) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Desc: [P] RFO: HARASSMENT Desc2: FILED 1/7/13 Desc3: -REISSUED FROM 1/21/13- Disp Code: 370 - AGREEMENT REACHED, REVIEW 07/15/13 Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER ON APP FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES/COSTS GRANTED TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
January 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Desc: [P] OSC: HARASSMENT Desc2: FILED 12/21/12 Desc3: -REISSUED FROM 1/7/13- Disp Code: 940 - REISSUED TO 01/28/13 Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Gunn, David E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.