Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allread Family Trust, Allread, Linda M, Allread, Terry T, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited case represented by Stearns, Georgia A, against Brannon, Mike G, Brunckhorst, David, Component Matrix Llc, French Quarter Project Llc, represented by Murphy, Austin, Adams, & Schoenfeld, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management184 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time401 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL Desc3: CONT FROM 9/27/13 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR; DISM Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLTF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF DEFS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL Notice Date: 2013-06-27 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLTF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF DEFS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc3: CONT FROM 5/3/13 Disp Code: 364 - SETTLED Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC FOR WRITTEN DISMISSAL/UNCONDITIONAL GEORGIA STEARNS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.