Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Garzon, Freddy Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2009 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Completed | |
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.