Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 09, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions524 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time524 days |
Document: Other
Date: January 13, 2016Request for Order: Modification
Date: November 17, 2020Request for Order: Modification
Date: February 24, 2021Request for Order: Modification
Date: October 06, 2020Request for Order: Modification
Date: August 18, 2020Request for Order: Modification
Date: July 07, 2020Request for Joinder
Date: August 17, 2016Notice: Entry of Judgment
Date: May 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order (Amended) Request for Order: Modification Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Documents Not Listed Document: Other |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Documents Not Listed Document: Other |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Request for Order: Modification Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.