Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in San Luis Obispo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Luis Obispo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff Guadalupe Cortes (“Plaintiff”) brought this medical malpractice action against Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, Dignity Health (collectively “Dignity”), and Clinton Slaughter, M.D. (“Dr. Sl...
Judge: Barry LaBarbera |
|
April 12, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff Guadalupe Cortes (“Plaintiff”) brought this medical malpractice action against Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, Dignity Health, and Clinton Slaughter, M.D., on January 28, 2014. On April 13...
Judge: Barry LaBarbera |
|
September 07, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Guadalupe Cortes (Plaintiff) brings this medical malpractice action against Arroyo Grande Community Hospital and Dignity Health (Defendants). On June 1, 2017, the Court granted Defendants’ motions to ...
Judge: Barry LaBarbera |
|
May 25, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendants’ Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted Guadalupe Cortes (Cortes) brings this medical malpractice action against Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, Dignity Health, and Clinton Slaug...
Judge: Barry LaBarbera |
|
April 13, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Guadalupe Cortes (Cortes) brings this medical malpractice action against Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, Dignity Health, and Clinton Slaughter, M.D. (Dr. Slaughter). On January 12, 2017, the Court g...
Judge: Barry LaBarbera |
|
January 12, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Guadalupe Cortes (Cortes) brings this medical malpractice action against Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, Dignity Health, and Clinton Slaughter, M.D. (Slaughter). On July 19, 2016, Slaughter propound...
Judge: Barry LaBarbera |
|
December 29, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Supplemental Request for Production of Documents Guadalupe Cortes (Cortes) brings this medical malpractice action against Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, Dignity Health and Clinton Slaughter, M.D. (...
Judge: Barry LaBarbera |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.