Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Avina Aka Rios, Andrea, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Avina, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mary Dolas presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 30, 2014 |
CategoryFamily Law |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned mail-no address found Custody Order-Juvenile Final Judgment returned by Post Office, no new address found for Michael Avina Jr. Document and envelope placed in file. 12-12-14 jmc |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Juvenile Custody Order - Final Judgment Date: 10/30/14 Scanned Date: 12/4/14 tll |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Any Comment Other case: 14CEFS00693. (Out of State Registration for Enforcement of Child Support.) tll 12/3/14 |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the CUSTODY ORDER-JUVENILE-FINAL JUDGMENT was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid or via inter-office mail and indicated as such on the Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California 93724 on 12/03/14. Parties served: Andrea Avina, Fresno Dependency Office, Michael Avina, Jr., Fresno County Counsel, Fresno Child Advocates, Dept. of Social Services and Juvenile Dependency Clerk's Office. tll 12/3/14 |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Juvenile Custody Order sent to scanning without case file. tll 12/3/14 |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Juvenile Custody Order Custody Order - Juvenile - Final Judgment signed by Judge Mary Dolas and filed confidential. Sole Legal and Sole Physical to mother, Andrea Avina. Physical Primary residence is with mother, Andrea Avina. tll 12/3/14 |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.