Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Raimundo J. Montes de Oca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Collections: Updated Information | |
November 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections Pending - Alliance One | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Modification: New Remand Date
Judge: Dandona, Jean |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.