Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anamerican Corporation, Oil And Gas Management Corporation, Finley Oil Well Services Inc, Pacific Operators Of Texas Inc, Pacific Operators Inc, (total of 18) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Trager, Timothy J, against Winton, James, Ivey, Jon David, Pennington, Lisa, Bakerhostetler, represented by Curtis, Robert A, Rosing, Heather L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions768 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time769 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Remittitur - Dismissed, Filed | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Remittitur, Filed | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Appeal, Filed | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
May 16, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion Terminating Atty-Fee Lien & Mod. Previous Order Motion to Terminate Attorney-Fee Lien and to Modify Previous Order Ruling The Court vacates its prior tentative ruling and...
Judge: Thomas Anderle |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Reply, Filed | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Response, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.