Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Erickson, Stephanie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Doherty, Brendan C, against Daigle, Elske, Daigle, Andrew V, Iii, Holo Holo Llc Et Al, represented by Mazza, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
Category06-Contract - Breach Cont/Warranty - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Demurrer
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service, Filed of Dismissal, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Full Dismissal, Filed Without Prejudice, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Case Mgmt Conference - Matter continued to 05/27/14., Filed; |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order, Filed Filed; |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement, Filed Filed; Filed By Defendant; |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.