Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insura Nce Co, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mendelson, Lee M, against Saldivar, Transito Z, Zapata, Amy Rachel, represented by Dougherty, Gerard Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryUninsured Motorist - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference (Further) Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed Retain Jusisdiction per CCP 664.6, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Further CMC - Case has settled. Dismissal will be filed by, Filed; 11-12-14. CMC continued; |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order, Filed Filed; |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference (Further) Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Unconditional Settlement Filed End Date: 2014-10-28 | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Demurrer; OSC:FTA at CMC on 6/11/14; CMC, Filed; Court made orders re Plaintiff's demurrer is moot; OSC:FTA discharged; CMC cont. to 10/1/14; |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Fail to Appear
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.