Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mixsell, William, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hall, James Michael, against Holt, Joseph, Hill, Eugene, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Motter, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2013 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment, Filed by Court After Court Trial, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 12/05/2013 Received; |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Motter, Denise |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Judgment for Plaintiff, Filed; |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report of Settlement Master, Filed MSC held; There was no agreement on any issue, Filed; |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial, Filed Filed; |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default, Filed AS TO Joseph Holt, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request to Set Case for Trial, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.