Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Seaman, Donald T, Jr, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Cater, Marcus, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession, Issued Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; 01/07/2014 Issued; |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Court, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; 01/09/2014 Received; |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit, Filed of Plaintiff in Lieu of Personal Testimony Pursuant to CCP, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; Sec 585(d) in Support of Request to Enter Default Judgment; |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Court Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unlawful Detainer CCP1161.2, Filed Filed; |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.