Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mendoza, Derenda, Mendoza, Allen, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Nettesheim, Christoph T, against Walgreen Co, Nguyen, Matthew, represented by Leibl, Loren S, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order, Filed of Stip & Order Granting Mtn to Relieve GAL |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed Unconditional |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing Request to Relieve Guardian Ad Litem Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order, Filed to Relieve Derenda Mendoza as Guardian Ad Litem - Granted |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application, Received EX PARTE HRG: 09/20/16 |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed of Michael Haverty, MD re Mtn to Relieve as GAL |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.