Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N, against Castillo, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed re Reduced Filing Fees, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint Contract, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.