Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N, against Lathery, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: December 31, 2013Complaint Contract, Filed
Date: December 27, 2013Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed
Date: May 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail, Filed | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed re Compliance with CCP Section 1033(b)(2), Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 05/06/2014 Received; |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint Contract, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.