Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dodd, David, Dodd, Michelle, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ghitterman, Russell R, against Betteravia Farms Llc, Bonita Packing Co, represented by Cholakian, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by David Dodd and Michelle Dodd against Bonita Packing, Betteravia Farms, and Does 1-10. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the case is the Superior...
Complaint PI/PD/WD Non Motor Vehicle, Filed
Date: October 10, 2013Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 30, 2014Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: October 22, 2014Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 22, 2014Case Management Order, Filed
Date: June 30, 2014Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 10, 2014Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 10, 2014Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 09, 2014Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 06, 2014Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 24, 2014Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed
Date: October 24, 2013Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 20, 2014Order, Filed
Date: January 06, 2015Memorandum, Filed
Date: June 30, 2015Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 30, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 06, 2015Reply, Filed
Date: July 28, 2015Answer, Filed
Date: May 07, 2015Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: October 05, 2015Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: October 05, 2015Request for Full Dismissal, Filed
Date: November 19, 2015Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: September 28, 2015Certification and Order re Destruction CCP 1952, Filed
Date: March 28, 2018Opposition, Filed
Date: July 21, 2015Motion, Filed
Date: June 30, 2015Complaint in Intervention, Filed
Date: March 30, 2015Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: November 26, 2014Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed
Date: November 03, 2015Answer, Filed
Date: November 19, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Certification and Order re Destruction CCP 1952, Filed | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Destruction of Exhibits, Depos, Admin Rec, Filed Kevin Cholakian |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Destruction of Exhibits, Depos, Admin Rec, Filed Russell R Ghitterman |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference re: Status of Dismissal Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Full Dismissal, Filed of Complaint with Prejudice |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial **to be heard at 8:30 am** Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed 11/16/15 jury trial vacated; CMC re status of Dismissal set for 1/11/16 |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed as to Complaint-in-Intervention with Prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.