Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Kay S. Kuns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKay S. Kuns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Plea & Dismissal per PC 1203.4 Hearing
Judge: Kuns, Kay |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Plea & Dismissal per PC 1203.4 Hearing
Judge: Kuns, Kay |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Dismissal (PC 17(b), PC 1203.4, et al), Filed | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Kuns, Kay |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance, Filed | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Installment Payment Application, Filed | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.