Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Cota, Brian J, against Lujan, Frank, represented by Mathis, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Dandona, Jean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryFelony-Lower |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Collections: Updated Information | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Delinquent - Court : FTP | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | DOJ Request - Subsequent | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate, Filed | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Document, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.