Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Raimundo J. Montes de Oca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Updated Information | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to Alliance One | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections Pending - Alliance One | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB IIC | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Collections: Referred to FTB COD | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Collections Pending - FTB COD | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment $300 | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Delinquent - Court : FTP | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.