Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pini, Dario L, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Balderaz, Ann Marie, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession, Issued Returned Unsatisfied, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed -Personal Service 1/2/14, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed -Possesion Only, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession, Issued Issued; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unlawful Detainer CCP1161.2, Filed Filed; |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.