Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Budget Rent A Car System Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Milligan, Samuel J, against Gibson, Jonathan N, Nelia, Chloe, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
Category06-Contract - Breach Cont/Warranty - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC cont'd to 9/24/14 at 8:30am in Dept 6 for service, Filed; |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC cont'd to 7/30/14 at 8:30am in Dept 6, Filed; |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement, Filed Hrg 4/30/14, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed Filed; |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.