Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Monarrez, Jesus, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vazquez, Moises, against Irvinewinkler, Eileen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Tort Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC vacated; dismissal previously filed, Filed; |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement, Filed -- hrg; 4/30/14, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed Filed; |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) -Granted, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Application (CRC 985(i)) Claim Amount/Principal: $435.00 Granted |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.