Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Walker-Schneider, Miriam Lucille, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed OSC:Name Change - Granted, Filed; |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause, Filed for Change of Name, Filed; Filed By Petitioner Pro Per; - hrg: 03/05/14 at 9:30 am in Dept 6; 01/06/2014 Received; |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name, Filed Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.