Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Greenwald, Elisabeth, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Mitchell, Carlene, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Judge, No Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed Mailed to all Parties, Filed; |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Small Claims Hearing held. The Court rendered, Filed; Judgment for the Plaintiff in the amount of $1,350 plus costs $30; |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Small Claims As to Carlene Mitchell by Certified Mail effective 1/13/13, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim Claim Amount/Principal: $1350.00 Cost: $30.00 Balance August rent 665 Del Parque Dr., Santa Barbara, CA |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.