Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Financial Credit Network, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gubler, E Warren, against Perez, Blanca J., in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed - Blanca J Perez, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; 01/03/2013 Filed; |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint Contract, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed of Anita Freyre re Fee Reduction, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.