Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pelletier, Karen Sue Head, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Shalhoob, John, Iii, Shalhoob, John, Jr, represented by Tappeiner, David J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 19, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Hearing for Defendant's Request This is the defendant’s motion to dismiss Plaintiff’s complaint, with prejudice, for failure to post bond of $20,000. Ruling Granted; the plainti...
Judge: Thomas Anderle |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement-Agreement or Non-Agreement, Filed - Ended in Non-Agreement on 11/12/13., Filed; |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Court dismissed case with prejudice, Filed; |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing for Defendants Request Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing, Filed Filed; Filed By Defendant; |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed - A Hearing is set for Defts' Request, Filed; Filed By Defendant; - hrg: 11/19/13 at 9:30 am in Dept3 ; 10/16/2013 Dismissing Pltiff's Complaint with Prejudice, Received; 10/21/2013 Dismissing Pltiff's Complaint with Prejudice, Received; |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed on Application to Vacate Prefiling Order and Remove Pltiff/, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; Petitioner from Judicial Council Vexatious Litigant List - DENIED ; 10/01/2013 to File New Litigation by Vexatious Litigant, Received; 10/01/2013 Filed; ;Denied ; |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request, Filed to File New Litigation by Vexatious Litigation, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff Pro Per; 10/01/2013 Received; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.