Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Novacoast Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schonauer, Paul E, Curtin, Margaret L, against Lack, David, E-Intake, represented by Dietsch, Thomas J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Judgment, Filed Against Deft E-Intake.com LLC, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 03/05/2014 Received; |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Restored to Court's Control Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed -as to David Lack ONLY, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement, Filed - Conditional, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service, Filed by First-Class Mail, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement Out of Ct Ctrl-Cond Settlement End Date: 2014-03-06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.