Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vehicles, Department Of Motor, Department Of Motor Vehicles, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Soublet, Brian G, against Custodian Of Records, California Highway Patrol, California Highway Patrol Custodian Of Records, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Per Court Order Case Consolidated w/1416848, 1416849,, Filed; 1416850, 1416851, 1416853, 1416854, 1416855, 1416856, 1418132, 1418133, 1418520, 1418533, 1416852, 1416876, w/1416847 as Lead Case.; |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC re Consolidation of Cases & Litigation Plan held. Case, Filed; consolidated w/ case 1416847 (Leadcase). CMC set in lead case for 1 0/30/13 at 9:30am in Dept 6.; |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference re: Consolidation of Cases & Litigation Plan Judge: Herman, James E |
|
September 11, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: OSC: Failure to Comply with Subpoenas Duces Tecum; OSC: Contempt for DMV's Failure to Personally Serve the CHP Tentative not yet posted, please check again.
Judge: James Herman |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed OSC re Failure to Comply w/ Subpoenas Duces Tecum, Filed; and OSC:Contempt for DMV's Failureto Personally Serve CHP - the Cou rt set a CMC re Consolidation of Cases/Litigation Plan for 9/25/13 at 8:30am in Dept 6; |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Contempt for DMV's Failure to Personally Serve the CHP Judge: Herman, James E |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to Comply with Subpoenas Duces Tecum Judge: Herman, James E |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed and Order to show Cause, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing, Filed and of Order to Show Cause Related to, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; Patrick Cunnane; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.