Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Amerifirst Home Improvement Finance Co, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dunning, Donald T, against Steele, Debra, Steele, James, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2013 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal, Filed and Proof of Service, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint, Filed Filed; Filed By Defendant; |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed as to James Steele by Personal Service on 05/13/2013, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed as to Debra Steel by Leaving Copies with, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; James Steele, Co Occupant on 05/13/2013; Mailed on 05/15/2013; |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Complaint |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.