Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M, against Fee, Nicole Marie, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2013 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed
Date: March 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed NOT Entered b/c Dismissal was already entered on 9/23/13; w/ Prejudice Noted. |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed for Entry of Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; and Dismissal Pursuant to CCP; |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation, Filed for Conditional Entry of Judgment, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement, Filed Conditional, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed Nicole Marie Fee, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed Filed; |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Complaint |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.