Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Alderete, Jaime, represented by Mcallister, Kirk W, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2010 |
CategoryConverted Criminal Fel-Misd-Inf |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2087 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion: After Disposition
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion & Motion | |
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Probation Hearing | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Probation Sentenced | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Pretrial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.