Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Golson, Gayla, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2012 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions55 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time55 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption, Filed | |
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.