Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall, Matthew W, against Giles, Debra A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management107 days |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2012 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Time To Trial381 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time392 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement, Filed | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice, Filed | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Trial Brief, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.