Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E, against Hinrichsen, Robert D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Non-Service, Filed | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.